U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00128-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Hammett et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 14, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • March 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 26, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • March 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • September 15, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2020: [Reply to Response]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 27, 2020: [Seal]
  • July 27, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • July 27, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • July 17, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 13, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 13, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 13, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 07, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 06, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 02, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 02, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 02, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • May 01, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 01, 2019: [Violation Report]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 03, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 29, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [Continue ]
  • April 19, 2018: [Violation Report]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2018: [Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 12, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 09, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 06, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 06, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 28, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 27, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 14, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • July 25, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 18, 2016: [Probable Cause Hearing]
  • May 11, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 06, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 05, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 04, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [2255 Motion Filed]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 17, 2015: [Reply to Response]
February, 2015
  • February 05, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
January, 2015
  • January 12, 2015: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
November, 2014
  • November 19, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 04, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2014
  • September 25, 2014: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2014
  • June 19, 2014: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.