U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00285-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elbert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 06, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 06, 2017: [Violation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 07, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • July 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 07, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2016: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • April 25, 2016: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • April 25, 2016: [Bond]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 25, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 11, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 31, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 31, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 31, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • March 31, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 31, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 31, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2014
  • June 20, 2014: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.