U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Dismiss ]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • August 30, 2016: [Pretrial Diversion Waiver]
  • August 30, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continue ]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 08, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 11, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 21, 2015: [Order]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 19, 2015: [Speedy Trial Excludable Start]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 12, 2015: [Continue ]
  • June 12, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2014
  • June 20, 2014: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.