U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caba et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 27, 2017: [Violation Report]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 13, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 01, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 25, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 01, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 17, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 15, 2016: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2014
  • June 20, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.