U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 01, 2025: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 09, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 09, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2022: [Violation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 16, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 16, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 16, 2020: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • December 16, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 11, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 11, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • December 09, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 09, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 19, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • October 17, 2020: [Document re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • October 06, 2020: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 06, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 15, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2020: [Unseal Document]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • August 17, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • August 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • April 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 03, 2018: [Violation Report]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 21, 2018: [Violation Report]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 30, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 30, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 19, 2015: [Order Returning Submission]
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 04, 2015: [Sealed Document]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2014
  • October 07, 2014: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
July, 2014
  • July 23, 2014: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2014
  • June 20, 2014: [USCA Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.