U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valentin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Returning Submission]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Exhibit]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • January 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 15, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • January 11, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Transcript]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 29, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 29, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • June 29, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 27, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • June 22, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • June 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 21, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 21, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 16, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 09, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • June 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 17, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 17, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 05, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • April 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2017: [Continue ]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • February 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 06, 2017: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 29, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 18, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Transcript]
  • January 17, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 10, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 08, 2017: [Transcript]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2016: [Sealed Document]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 24, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • August 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 29, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
  • July 18, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • May 11, 2016: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 11, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 11, 2016: [Witness List]
  • May 06, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • May 03, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • May 03, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 03, 2016: [Jury Trial]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 27, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 25, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 20, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 19, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 18, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 18, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 17, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 17, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • April 15, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 15, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 13, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 12, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 11, 2016: [Jury Trial]
  • April 11, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 08, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 06, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 05, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • April 01, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • April 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Preclude]
  • March 30, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 29, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 05, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 05, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 01, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • March 01, 2016: [Trial Memo]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 01, 2016: [Seal]
  • March 01, 2016: [In Limine ]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Letter]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 12, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 05, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • October 01, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • September 21, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • September 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
June, 2014
  • June 20, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.