U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00195-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dyber et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 09, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 14, 2022: [Violation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 24, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 05, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • March 05, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 23, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • April 23, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 29, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 18, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 15, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 15, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 31, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 31, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 31, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 22, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 17, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order]
  • February 26, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 25, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 23, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 23, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2014
  • August 21, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 19, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2014
  • July 29, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2014
  • June 20, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.