U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Netter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 19, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order]
June, 2014
  • June 24, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.