U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
  • March 19, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Transcript]
June, 2014
  • June 24, 2014: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.