U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00206-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prejean
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Continue ]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 28, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • January 08, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 11, 2019: [Competency Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Continue ]
  • March 05, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 01, 2019: [Hearing ]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Returning Submission]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 27, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 21, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 20, 2018: [Hearing ]
  • November 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 07, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 07, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2018: [Continue ]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 06, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
June, 2014
  • June 24, 2014: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.