U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 17, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • September 17, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 07, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 07, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • April 08, 2020: [Bond]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 09, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • March 06, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • March 06, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 04, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 13, 2020: [Continue ]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 05, 2019: [Continue ]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continue ]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 13, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 06, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 31, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • July 31, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 17, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 17, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2014
  • June 24, 2014: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.