U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00113-27
  • Case Name: USA v. Velez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 02, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 01, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • October 18, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 11, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 11, 2016: [Violation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 07, 2015: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 02, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 01, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 24, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • November 20, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
  • November 19, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • November 18, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 18, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • November 18, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 18, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 26, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 22, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 21, 2015: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 16, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 14, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 14, 2015: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 13, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 01, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [USCA Request]
September, 2014
  • September 19, 2014: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2014
  • July 13, 2014: [Transcript]
  • July 03, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2014
  • June 25, 2014: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.