U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Matheney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 17, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 26, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 26, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • September 25, 2019: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 20, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 20, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 02, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 20, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 20, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Continue ]
  • April 17, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • April 11, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 03, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 14, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 10, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 07, 2016: [Continue ]
  • November 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 04, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • September 01, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2014
  • June 25, 2014: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.