U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00154-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Watson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 07, 2021: [Violation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 18, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 03, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 29, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 23, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 21, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 17, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 16, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 04, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 19, 2019: [Violation Report]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 14, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 14, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 06, 2019: [Violation Report]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Search Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 05, 2016: [Search Warrant Issued ]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sealed Document]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Judgment]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 27, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 19, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 14, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 06, 2015: [Judgment]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 29, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 26, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 19, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2015
  • February 01, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
July, 2014
  • July 14, 2014: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
June, 2014
  • June 25, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.