U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Agosto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order of Transfer]
  • May 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 31, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • May 09, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2014
  • June 25, 2014: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.