U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:02-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order]
  • March 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 03, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • July 19, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Violation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 14, 2016: [Continue ]
  • June 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 09, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 06, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 16, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
October, 2014
  • October 28, 2014: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2014
  • June 26, 2014: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.