U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kaya
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 24, 2018: [Travel ]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 24, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Transcript]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Extension of Time]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 12, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 03, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 03, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2015
  • October 12, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 29, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2015: [Extension of Time]
June, 2014
  • June 26, 2014: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.