U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00190-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 15, 2021: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • October 13, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 14, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 17, 2021: [Violation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 11, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • August 07, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 10, 2020: [Continue ]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 07, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continue ]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 09, 2019: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 21, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 19, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 11, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 11, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
August, 2014
  • August 08, 2014: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2014
  • June 26, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.