U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Givens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2025: [Judgment - Revocation]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 03, 2023: [Violation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 13, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 01, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2021
  • January 24, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 18, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
April, 2016
  • April 03, 2016: [Transcript]
August, 2015
  • August 03, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 03, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 23, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • July 21, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 21, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 21, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 21, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 08, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 08, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 07, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
June, 2014
  • June 27, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.