U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • January 22, 2018: [Seal]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 22, 2017: [Seal]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 30, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 30, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order]
  • May 12, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 12, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2017: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 28, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 21, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2014
  • June 30, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.