U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fabian-Pichardo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • August 11, 2015: [Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 28, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 23, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 23, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2014
  • June 30, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.