U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • March 12, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 12, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Reply to Response]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 08, 2021: [Strike ]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [ExParte Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2020: [Unseal Document]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 01, 2016: [Transcript]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Transcript]
July, 2014
  • July 02, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.