U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Restitution Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • January 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 06, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 28, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 30, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 17, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2014
  • July 02, 2014: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.