U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brecciano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • October 15, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • October 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 22, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 13, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2014
  • July 02, 2014: [Sealed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.