U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 12, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 10, 2020: [Violation Report]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 17, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 22, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 18, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Transcript]
July, 2014
  • July 09, 2014: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.