U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Sealed Order]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 18, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 26, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • June 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2014
  • July 09, 2014: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.