U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Huertas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sealed Document]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 28, 2016: [Reconsideration]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 11, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 11, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2015: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 01, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • December 01, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 18, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 06, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 04, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 29, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • July 16, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 07, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2014
  • July 10, 2014: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.