U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ciuro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 09, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • June 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 26, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continue ]
  • January 02, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 06, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 28, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 23, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 04, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 28, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 28, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 20, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 24, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • October 18, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 18, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • July 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 26, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 24, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 13, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 13, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • July 11, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 03, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • July 03, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 10, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 09, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 06, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 06, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 06, 2017: [Arrest ]
July, 2014
  • July 10, 2014: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.