U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00268-18
  • Case Name: USA v. Roman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 04, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 15, 2022: [Dismiss ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • February 22, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 19, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 19, 2021: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • February 04, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 13, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 16, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 10, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 09, 2020: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 29, 2020: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • November 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • November 08, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2019
  • September 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
July, 2019
  • July 28, 2019: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 11, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 08, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 03, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • July 02, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 02, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 28, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 17, 2019: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
  • June 17, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 12, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • May 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 17, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 14, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continue ]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • April 23, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 05, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 04, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 01, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • March 29, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2019: [Continue ]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2018: [Continue ]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continue ]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 25, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • July 19, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • July 03, 2018: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 08, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 21, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 07, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 02, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 17, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 26, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 25, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 22, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • July 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 27, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 20, 2016: [Violation Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 24, 2016: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 15, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2015: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 09, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • December 09, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 03, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 19, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • November 05, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 23, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 21, 2015: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 21, 2015: [Summons Issued]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • July 14, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 22, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 22, 2015: [Summons Issued]
January, 2015
  • January 29, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2015: [Order]
November, 2014
  • November 19, 2014: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2014
  • August 18, 2014: [Notice]
July, 2014
  • July 10, 2014: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.