U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:99-cr-00085-10
  • Case Name: USA v. Segura et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 13, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order of Transfer]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 08, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 30, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine - 18:3582]
  • August 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel re Crack Cocaine]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence Crack Cocaine Offense 18:3582]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Reply to Response]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 03, 2015: [Extension of Time]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Document re Reduction of Sentence re: Crack Cocaine 18:3582]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2015: [Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 21, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2015
  • May 13, 2015: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
December, 2014
  • December 26, 2014: [Miscellaneous Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2014
  • September 29, 2014: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2014
  • July 10, 2014: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.