U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00263-17
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyd et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Compel ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • August 25, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 19, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 15, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • February 08, 2021: [Transcript]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Reconsideration]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • November 13, 2020: [Hearing ]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 05, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 30, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 26, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • October 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 06, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 30, 2020: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
  • September 24, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 11, 2020: [Continue ]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 28, 2020: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2020: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • February 14, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • February 07, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Appearance Pro Se]
  • January 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • November 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 06, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 10, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 02, 2019: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • May 01, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 25, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 11, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • March 04, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 19, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2019: [Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 10, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 03, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Continue ]
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 30, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • November 15, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 13, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 13, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 26, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 26, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 01, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 16, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 16, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 13, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 15, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 11, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 22, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 10, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 09, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 09, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 08, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 14, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 13, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 19, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • June 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 26, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 26, 2017: [Violation Report]
April, 2017
  • April 30, 2017: [Continue ]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 22, 2017: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Continue ]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 03, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • November 03, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • November 03, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 02, 2016: [Continue ]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 30, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 27, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2016: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 06, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 23, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • August 05, 2016: [Instrument Returned]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order]
  • June 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 03, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 03, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 01, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 25, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 23, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 08, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 02, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 01, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 30, 2015: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 30, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 25, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 16, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 12, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • November 10, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 09, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2015
  • October 10, 2015: [Transcript]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Transcript]
  • September 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • August 19, 2015: [Instrument Returned]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Joinder ]
  • June 24, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2015
  • March 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
December, 2014
  • December 19, 2014: [Extension of Time]
  • December 04, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2014
  • July 11, 2014: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.