U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 14, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 25, 2018: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Approve Associate Counsel]
  • August 15, 2018: [Approve Associate Counsel]
  • August 08, 2018: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 07, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continue ]
  • July 23, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 19, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 30, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 29, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
July, 2014
  • July 11, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.