U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Writ Returned]
  • April 06, 2022: [Hearing ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 10, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2014
  • July 11, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.