U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:01-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bornman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [ExParte Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • March 25, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 09, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 11, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • August 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 07, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 29, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 05, 2020: [Continue ]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 13, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 13, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 12, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 24, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 23, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 23, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 23, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 25, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 24, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 22, 2019: [Arrest ]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • October 01, 2018: [Status Conference]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 16, 2017: [Dismiss ]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Appearance Pro Se]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 18, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • November 19, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 12, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2014
  • July 11, 2014: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.