U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00281-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cunningham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 24, 2016: [Violation Report]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2014
  • July 14, 2014: [Vacate ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.