U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anusavice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 09, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • October 09, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • February 19, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 24, 2016: [Exoneration of Bond]
July, 2014
  • July 15, 2014: [Forfeiture of Property ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.