U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Extension of Time]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Extension of Time]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 05, 2016: [Seal]
  • April 01, 2016: [Sealed Document]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 30, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2016: [Transcript]
  • February 01, 2016: [Transcript]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 19, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 17, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 16, 2015: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 16, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • November 16, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 03, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2015: [Sentencing]
October, 2015
  • October 31, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 31, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 31, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 27, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 27, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 22, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2015
  • August 11, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 07, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 04, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 22, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 14, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 12, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2014
  • September 30, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2014
  • July 15, 2014: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.