U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dudley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 01, 2022: [Violation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
  • April 18, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • October 17, 2019: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 20, 2018: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 20, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 14, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 13, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • November 13, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 09, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 25, 2018: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • October 04, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 12, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2018
  • July 29, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 28, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order for PSI and Report]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 25, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continue ]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Conflict Hearing]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 31, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 13, 2018: [Continue ]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 14, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 13, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • November 03, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on ExParte Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [ExParte Motion]
  • October 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 26, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 24, 2017: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2017: [Continue ]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 09, 2017: [Continue ]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continue ]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Continue ]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Speedy Trial]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2016: [Continue ]
December, 2015
  • December 26, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 11, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continue ]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 12, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • August 20, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 20, 2015: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2015: [Continue ]
July, 2014
  • July 18, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.