U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00126-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Lancia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 04, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Appearance Pro Se]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 01, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 26, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 10, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 28, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 23, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 22, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • July 13, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 09, 2015: [Order]
  • July 09, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2015: [Letter]
January, 2015
  • January 14, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2014
  • July 22, 2014: [Early Termination of Probation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.