U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00162-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosado
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 31, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • January 27, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 25, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 27, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 27, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 25, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 30, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 30, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 29, 2020: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 23, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • March 18, 2020: [Extension of Time]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 14, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Arrest ]
  • February 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 12, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 16, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • January 16, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 10, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 10, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 23, 2017: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • February 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 04, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 04, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • February 04, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • February 03, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 27, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 27, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • January 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
July, 2014
  • July 23, 2014: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.