U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00058-13
  • Case Name: USA v. Cancel et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Transfer]
  • February 23, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 22, 2022: [Violation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Transcript]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 12, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 18, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2015
  • May 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2014
  • December 18, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
September, 2014
  • September 04, 2014: [Transcript]
August, 2014
  • August 12, 2014: [Pretrial Detention]
July, 2014
  • July 23, 2014: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.