U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pantojas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 04, 2024: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 03, 2024: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 02, 2024: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • October 02, 2024: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 02, 2024: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 16, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
  • November 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 21, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Seal]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 27, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Arrest ]
  • July 29, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • July 29, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • July 29, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 28, 2015: [Pretrial Detention]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 26, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • June 26, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 22, 2015: [Seal]
  • June 22, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
July, 2014
  • July 28, 2014: [Sealed Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.