U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Evangelista
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 27, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 27, 2017: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • March 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Bond]
July, 2014
  • July 30, 2014: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.