U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00093-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Babar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 01, 2021: [Reply to Response]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • February 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Reply to Response]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 22, 2020: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • December 15, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 30, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Writ Issued]
  • August 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 28, 2019: [Seal]
  • August 28, 2019: [Application for Writ]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 20, 2018: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 14, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continue ]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2018: [Appearance Pro Se]
  • August 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 16, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 03, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 11, 2018: [Hearing ]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 23, 2017: [Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals]
  • June 23, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 15, 2017: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 08, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • March 22, 2017: [Return of Passport]
  • March 22, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 20, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 20, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 05, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • May 05, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 05, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Writ Returned]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Writ Returned]
  • March 24, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • March 18, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Sealed Document]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reduction of Sentence (non-drug)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Reduce Sentence (non-drug)]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [2255 Motion Filed]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • August 03, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
March, 2015
  • March 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
August, 2014
  • August 27, 2014: [Reply/Response Misc]
July, 2014
  • July 31, 2014: [USCA Mandate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.