U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • January 26, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 13, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 13, 2021: [Application for Writ]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 26, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 26, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 21, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • October 20, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 20, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 25, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • September 22, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 21, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 21, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2020: [Summons Issued]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 20, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • December 21, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • November 30, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • November 30, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 30, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 25, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 25, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 25, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • November 25, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 24, 2015: [Payment]
  • November 20, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 20, 2015: [Seal]
  • November 20, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 19, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 14, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • October 01, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2015
  • September 03, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 07, 2015: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 02, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Travel ]
July, 2014
  • July 31, 2014: [Bail Information Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.