U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00250-14
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Guzman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 25, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • January 24, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • January 24, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • January 23, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 23, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2015
  • January 06, 2015: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
December, 2014
  • December 31, 2014: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • December 30, 2014: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2014
  • August 01, 2014: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.