U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2016
  • January 06, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 05, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 05, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 10, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • December 10, 2015: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 10, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2015
  • November 03, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • November 02, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 02, 2015: [Violation Report]
August, 2014
  • August 01, 2014: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.