U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 21, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 21, 2016: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • December 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 23, 2016: [Seal]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Document]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Seal]
  • October 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Seal]
  • June 15, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 17, 2016: [Seal]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 21, 2015: [Seal]
  • October 02, 2015: [Order]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 15, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 15, 2015: [Seal]
August, 2014
  • August 05, 2014: [Sealed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.