U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 30, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2021: [Extension of Time]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Transcript]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue ]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 01, 2020: [Sealed Document]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 30, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 25, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • November 20, 2020: [Seal]
  • November 20, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2020: [Continue ]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 20, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 14, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 14, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 14, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 13, 2020: [Seal]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 22, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 22, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 22, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 08, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • May 04, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 01, 2020: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 01, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • May 01, 2020: [Seal]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2020: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • February 11, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 06, 2016: [Index to Record on Appeal]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice]
  • March 28, 2016: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 17, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • March 17, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 11, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 05, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 31, 2015: [Extension of Time]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • June 22, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2015: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 19, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 18, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 17, 2015: [Appear]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2015: [In Limine ]
August, 2014
  • August 05, 2014: [Daubert Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.