U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00147-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Flowers et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 02, 2018: [Restitution Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Seal]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 14, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2018: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 14, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2018: [Dismiss ]
  • March 07, 2018: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 15, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Continue ]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 23, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 22, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 19, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 13, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • April 13, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 21, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 12, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 25, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • January 20, 2016: [Pretrial Diversion Waiver]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 19, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 19, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 18, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • January 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • January 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • January 16, 2016: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 13, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • January 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • January 08, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • January 07, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • January 04, 2016: [Jury Selection]
  • January 04, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2016: [Voir Dire Begun]
  • January 04, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Strike ]
  • December 31, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • December 21, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 16, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 14, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 11, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 04, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • December 04, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 04, 2015: [Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2015: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 04, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2015: [Speedy Trial]
  • December 01, 2015: [Status Conference]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 04, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 28, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 28, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 28, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2015: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 15, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • October 14, 2015: [Hearing ]
  • October 08, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
  • September 22, 2015: [Speedy Trial]
  • September 22, 2015: [Appear]
  • September 04, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 26, 2015: [Order]
  • August 10, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 04, 2015: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
July, 2015
  • July 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 02, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2014
  • November 17, 2014: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2014
  • September 30, 2014: [Bond]
August, 2014
  • August 06, 2014: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.